UT HB0251S01 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0251
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Unsworn Declaration Amendments
Title
Unsworn Declaration Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-14 - House - House Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-14 - House - House Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | House/ filed in HFILE |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-13 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTHHS |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in SSTRUL |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTHHS |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTHHS |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2014-03-06 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-03-05 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-03-05 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-25 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-25 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in HSTJUD |
2014-02-25 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTJUD |
2014-02-25 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTJUD |
2014-02-25 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTJUD |
2014-02-25 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTJUD |
2014-02-21 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTJUD |
2014-02-20 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTJUD |
2014-02-19 | House | House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL |
2014-02-18 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTRUL |
2014-02-14 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTEDU |
2014-02-04 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTEDU |
2014-01-31 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in HSTEDU |
2014-01-30 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU |
2014-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-01-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Printing in HCLERK |
2014-01-03 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0251 (Replaces) 2014-02-25 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in HSUB