UT HB0251 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alarm System Amendments
Title
Alarm System Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 49 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 49 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-15 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-03-01 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-01 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON | |
2011-02-24 | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTBUS | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTBUS | |
2011-02-16 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS | |
2011-02-16 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2011-02-15 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2011-02-14 | House/ circled in H3RDHB | |
2011-02-04 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-02-03 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS | |
2011-01-28 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-27 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-27 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-26 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-26 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |