UT HB0249S01 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0249
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grants for Digital Textbooks
Title
Grants for Digital Textbooks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-02-21 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 55 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-21 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 55 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | House/ filed in HFILE |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-13 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in SSTEDU |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in SSTEDU |
2014-02-25 | Senate | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTEDU |
2014-02-24 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTEDU |
2014-02-24 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTEDU |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTEDU |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2014-02-21 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-02-21 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-02-21 | House | House/ substituted in H3RDHB |
2014-02-21 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-20 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in H3RDHB |
2014-02-12 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-12 | House | House/ committee report favorable in HSTEDU |
2014-02-11 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTEDU |
2014-02-07 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTEDU |
2014-01-30 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU |
2014-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-01-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Printing in HCLERK |
2014-01-03 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0249 (Replaces) 2014-02-21 - House/ substituted in HSUB