UT HB0248 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Government Records Amendments
Title
Government Records Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-18 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2010-02-19 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-19 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-18 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2010-02-18 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2010-02-11 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-02-10 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP | |
2010-02-05 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-04 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-04 | House/ 3rd reading in HCON | |
2010-02-01 | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTGOC | |
2010-02-01 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTGOC | |
2010-01-29 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in HSTGOC | |
2010-01-28 | House/ to standing committee in HSTGOC | |
2010-01-27 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-27 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-26 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-26 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |