UT HB0245S02 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0245S01
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Fire Code Amendments
Title
State Fire Code Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2014-03-19 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2014-03-19 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2014-03-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2014-02-27 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-27 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-27 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-02-27 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2014-02-26 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2014-02-26 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2014-02-26 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2014-02-26 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in SPRES |
2014-02-25 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL |
2014-02-25 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-02-25 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK |
2014-02-25 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in SCON |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ circled in SCON |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSTBUS |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTBUS |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2014-02-13 | Senate | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTBUS |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ lifted from standing committee in SSTGOP |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTGOP |
2014-02-11 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in SSTGOP |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-10 | Senate | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSEC |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2014-02-07 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-02-07 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-02-07 | House | House/ 3rd reading in HCON |
2014-02-05 | House | House/ 2nd reading in HCON |
2014-02-05 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in HSTBUS |
2014-02-04 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTBUS |
2014-02-04 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTBUS |
2014-02-04 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS |
2014-02-04 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTBUS |
2014-01-30 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS |
2014-01-27 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-01-22 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Printing in HCLERK |
2014-01-03 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-03 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0245S01 (Replaces) 2014-02-20 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSUB