UT HB0242 | 2023 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Services for People with Disabilities Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Services for People with Disabilities Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-03HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2023-03-03HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2023-03-03HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2023-03-03SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2023-02-23SenateSenate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table
2023-02-23SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2023-02-23SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-21SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2023-02-21SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2023-02-21SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2023-02-16SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2023-02-12SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee
2023-02-12SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee
2023-02-10SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2023-02-10SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2023-02-09SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2023-02-09SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2023-02-09HouseHouse/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-02-09HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-02-06HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-02-06HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-02-03HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-02-03HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Health and Human Services Committee
2023-02-01HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee
2023-02-01HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Health and Human Services Committee
2023-01-27HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee
2023-01-26HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2023-01-20HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2023-01-20HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2023-01-19 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2023-01-19 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/static/HB0242.html
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillint/HB0242.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillint/HB0242S01.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillint/HB0242S02.pdf
Amendmenthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/pamend/hb0242.hfa.01.pdf
Amendmenthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/pamend/hb0242s01.hfa.01.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/HB0242.fn.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillint/HB0242S01_ComparedWith_HB0242.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/HB0242S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillint/HB0242S02_ComparedWith_HB0242.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/HB0242S02.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=26334
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=26335
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2023GS&voteid=397&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=27595
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2023GS&voteid=1220&house=S

Bill Comments

feedback