UT HB0235 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Family School Partnership
Title
Family School Partnership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-31 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-06 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in House Rules Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Education Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Education Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Education Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | House Comm - Held in House Education Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Education Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Education Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2018-01-26 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2018-01-25 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-01-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Charter Schools
Children
Education
Local Boards of Education
Public Education
State Board of Education
Trust Lands
Children
Education
Local Boards of Education
Public Education
State Board of Education
Trust Lands