UT HB0233 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Retirement Office Amendments
Title
Retirement Office Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-18 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2010-03-16 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-11 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-11 | Senate/ to House in HSPKR | |
2010-03-11 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in SPRES | |
2010-03-09 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-03-02 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2010-03-01 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTRIE | |
2010-02-16 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-12 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-12 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-04 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTRIE | |
2010-02-03 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTRIE | |
2010-01-26 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-25 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-25 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |