UT HB0232 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Attorney General Authority Amendments
Title
Attorney General Authority Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Brian King [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-04 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-26 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-25 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-25 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-22 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-22 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-22 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
67 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 5 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |