UT HB0232 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Language Interpreter Amendments
Title
Medical Language Interpreter Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2010-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-02-23 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-22 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2010-02-22 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2010-02-22 | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTHHS | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTHHS | |
2010-02-08 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-05 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2010-02-05 | House/ 3rd reading in HCON | |
2010-02-02 | House/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal in HSTHHS | |
2010-02-02 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTHHS | |
2010-01-29 | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTHHS | |
2010-01-26 | House/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-25 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-25 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |