UT HB0229 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-26 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Criminal Identity Fraud Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Identity Fraud Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-02-19 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-26 Governor Signed in ELTGOV
2013-03-20 House/ to Governor in EGOV
2013-03-19HouseHouse/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK
2013-03-19HouseEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK
2013-03-08 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2013-03-07 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2013-03-07 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2013-03-07HouseHouse/ received from Senate in HSPKR
2013-03-07HouseSenate/ to House in HSPKR
2013-03-07HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR
2013-03-07SenateSenate/ passed 3rd reading in SPRES
2013-03-07SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in SCON
2013-03-04SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in SCON
2013-03-04SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTJLC
2013-03-01SenateSenate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTJLC
2013-03-01SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC
2013-02-21SenateSenate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC
2013-02-20SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2013-02-20SenateSenate/ received from House in SINTRO
2013-02-19SenateHouse/ to Senate in SSEC
2013-02-19SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC
2013-02-19HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in HCON
2013-02-14HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in HCON
2013-02-14HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTLAW
2013-02-13HouseHouse Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTLAW
2013-02-13HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTLAW
2013-02-12HouseHouse/ to standing committee in HSTLAW
2013-02-11HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL
2013-02-08HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL
2013-02-08HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL
2013-02-07HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2013-02-07HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK
2013-02-06 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2013-02-06 Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC
2013-02-06 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback