UT HB0228S04 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0228S03
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic Beverage Control Act Amendments
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Control Act Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - House - House Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ refused to recede from Senate amendments (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House/ refuse to concur with Senate amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 63 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ refused to recede from Senate amendments (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House/ refuse to concur with Senate amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 63 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2013-03-22 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2013-03-21 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2013-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-19 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-14 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-14 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2013-03-14 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2013-03-14 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2013-03-14 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2013-03-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2013-03-14 | Senate | House Conference Committee - Final Passage in SPRES |
2013-03-14 | House Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in CONCOM | |
2013-03-14 | House/ received from Senate in CONCOM | |
2013-03-14 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in CONCOM | |
2013-03-14 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in CONCOM | |
2013-03-14 | Senate/ to House in CONCOM | |
2013-03-14 | Senate Conference Committee - Final Passage in CONCOM | |
2013-03-14 | Senate Motion to Adopt Joint Conference Comm Rpt in CONCOM | |
2013-03-14 | Bill Substituted by Conference Committee in CONCOM | |
2013-03-14 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in CONCOM | |
2013-03-13 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed in CONCOM | |
2013-03-13 | Senate/ received from House in CONCOM | |
2013-03-13 | House/ to Senate in CONCOM | |
2013-03-13 | House Conference Committee Appointed in CONCOM | |
2013-03-13 | House/ received from Senate in CONCOM | |
2013-03-13 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ refused to recede from Senate amendments in SSEC |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SSEC |
2013-03-13 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-13 | Senate | House/ refuse to concur with Senate amendment in SSEC |
2013-03-13 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL |
2013-03-13 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2013-03-13 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK |
2013-03-13 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in S2ND |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2013-03-07 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2013-03-05 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDHB |
2013-03-05 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDHB |
2013-03-01 | House | House/ circled in H3RDHB |
2013-03-01 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-02-27 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2013-02-27 | House | House/ committee report favorable in HSTREV |
2013-02-27 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTREV |
2013-02-08 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTREV |
2013-02-08 | House | House/ substituted by Rules in HSTRUL |
2013-02-08 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTRUL |
2013-02-07 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2013-02-06 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2013-02-06 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2013-02-06 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0228S03 (Replaces) 2013-03-14 - Bill Substituted by Conference Committee in SSUB
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverage Control
Alcoholic Beverages
Business
Government Operations (State Issues)
State Officers and Employees
Alcoholic Beverages
Business
Government Operations (State Issues)
State Officers and Employees