UT HB0221 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - Senate/ substituted by Rules in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - Senate/ substituted by Rules in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sunset Act and Repealers Reauthorization
Title
Sunset Act and Repealers Reauthorization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | Senate/ substituted by Rules in SSUB | |
2010-02-01 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-01-29 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2010-01-29 | House/ 3rd reading in HCON | |
2010-01-26 | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTGOC | |
2010-01-26 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTGOC | |
2010-01-25 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-13 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-13 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-07 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |