UT HB0218 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal Disincorporation Revisions
Title
Municipal Disincorporation Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2010-03-11 | Senate/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in SSTGOP | |
2010-02-22 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP | |
2010-02-16 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2010-02-12 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2010-02-05 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-05 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTGOC | |
2010-01-28 | House/ to standing committee in HSTGOC | |
2010-01-25 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-08 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-08 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET | |
2010-01-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2009-11-19 | LFA/ bill assigned to staff for fiscal analysis in LRGC |