UT HB0201 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-21 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-21 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tobacco Licensing Amendments
Title
Tobacco Licensing Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-21 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2011-03-16 | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK | |
2011-03-15 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-02-18 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-17 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2011-02-17 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2011-02-17 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2011-02-16 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-02-10 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTHHS | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTHHS | |
2011-02-01 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-31 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-01-31 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-01-28 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTHHS | |
2011-01-25 | House Comm - Not Considered in HSTHHS | |
2011-01-24 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-01-05 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in LRGC | |
2011-01-04 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in LRGC | |
2010-12-22 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2010-11-18 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC |