UT HB0190 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Liability of Firearm Custodian
Title
Liability of Firearm Custodian
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 3 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Comm - Refer to Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 3 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-03-06 - House - House Comm - Refer to Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-11 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Comm - Held in House Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | House Comm - Refer to Committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | House Comm - Held in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | House Comm - Held in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2019-01-28 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |