UT HB0188 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-18 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-18 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Labor Commission Related Amendments
Title
Labor Commission Related Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Mayne [D] | Rep. Mike Morley [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-07 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-17 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK | |
2011-02-09 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-02-08 | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR | |
2011-02-08 | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR | |
2011-02-07 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-02-04 | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL | |
2011-02-04 | Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK | |
2011-02-04 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2011-02-03 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-02-01 | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTBUS | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTBUS | |
2011-01-28 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-27 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-01-27 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-01-26 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTBUS | |
2011-01-24 | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS | |
2011-01-22 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HINTRO | |
2011-01-22 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HINTRO | |
2011-01-10 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-07 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |