UT HB0187 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Agricultural Assessment Amendments
Title
Agricultural Assessment Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kohler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2022-02-28 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-02-11 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-18 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-18 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-18 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 2 | 1703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2 | 1705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2 | 1707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2 | 506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |