UT HB0181 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Railroad Crossing Maintenance Amendments
Title
Railroad Crossing Maintenance Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2022-03-10 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2022-03-10 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-08 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-08 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-04 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2022-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2022-03-04 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ uncircled in House Concurrence Calendar |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ circled in House Concurrence Calendar |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 3rd Reading Calendar table in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar Table |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 3 to # 4 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3 in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-08 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-08 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-08 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-07 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-07 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-01 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-01 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Transportation Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Transportation Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in House Transportation Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Transportation Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
54 | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
54 | 3 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
54 | 4 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
54 | 4 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
54 | 4 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
54 | 4 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |