UT HB0177 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Health Education Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Education Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-26 - House - House/ failed (Y: 31 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-02-08 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2021-02-27HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House file for bills not passed
2021-02-27HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House file for bills not passed
2021-02-26HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2021-02-26HouseHouse/ failed in Clerk of the House
2021-02-26HouseHouse/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-26HouseHouse/ substituted from # 3 to # 4 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-26HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-19HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-19HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-18HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-18HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Education Committee
2021-02-17HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Education Committee
2021-02-17HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 2 to # 3 in House Education Committee
2021-02-17HouseHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Education Committee
2021-02-08HouseHouse Comm - Held in House Education Committee
2021-02-08HouseHouse Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Education Committee
2021-02-08HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Education Committee
2021-02-08HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in House Education Committee
2021-01-28HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Education Committee
2021-01-20HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2021-01-18 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-18 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53G10402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53G10403Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/HB0177.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0177.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0177S02.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0177S03.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0177S04.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillamd/HB0177S04.pdf
Amendmenthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/pamend/hb0177s02.hca.01.pdf
Amendmenthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/pamend/hb0177s04.hfvp.01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0177.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0177.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0177S01_ComparedWith_HB0177.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0177S01.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0177S02_ComparedWith_HB0177S01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0177S02.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0177S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0177S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0177S03_ComparedWith_HB0177S02.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0177S03.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0177S03.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0177S04_ComparedWith_HB0177S03.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0177S04.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0177S04.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19254
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19256
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19265
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19263
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19837
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19838
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=823&house=H

Bill Comments 750

feedback