UT HB0173 | 2023 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Citizen Empowerment Task Force

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Citizen Empowerment Task Force

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-03HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2023-03-03HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2023-02-25HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-02-24HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-02-24HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-02-24HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-02-23HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2023-02-23HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2023-02-22HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2023-02-22HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2023-02-22HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3 in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2023-02-21HouseHouse Comm - Held in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2023-01-24HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Political Subdivisions Committee
2023-01-17HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2023-01-17HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2023-01-11HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2023-01-06 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2023-01-06 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
63I2236Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/static/HB0173.html
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillint/HB0173.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillint/HB0173S03.pdf
Texthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillamd/HB0173S03.pdf
Amendmenthttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/pamend/hb0173s03.hca.01.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/HB0173.fn.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillint/HB0173S01_ComparedWith_HB0173.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/HB0173S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillint/HB0173S02_ComparedWith_HB0173.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillint/HB0173S03_ComparedWith_HB0173S02.pdf
Supplementhttps://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/HB0173S03.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=27846
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=27852
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=27858

Bill Comments

feedback