UT HB0172 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Food Sales Tax Modifications
Title
Food Sales Tax Modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-16 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-12 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-11 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-06 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-06 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-01-06 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 12 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 12 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 12 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 12 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 12 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 12 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63N | 7 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/static/HB0172.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2023/bills/hbillint/HB0172.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2023/HB0172.fn.pdf |