UT HB0165 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Noise Pollution Amendments
Title
Noise Pollution Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-27 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-27 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Transportation Committee |
2021-02-01 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Transportation Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | House Comm - Held in House Transportation Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | House Comm - Motion to Table Failed in House Transportation Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Transportation Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Transportation Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-18 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-17 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-13 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-13 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Emissions Control
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Noise Abatement
Roads/Highways
Traffic Violations
Transportation
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Noise Abatement
Roads/Highways
Traffic Violations
Transportation