UT HB0159 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Political Contributions Amendments
Title
Political Contributions Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Daw [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-01 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-01 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-06 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ amended in House Rules Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Government Operations Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | House Comm - Held in House Government Operations Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Government Operations Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Government Operations Committee |
2018-01-26 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2018-01-19 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2018-01-18 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House |
2018-01-11 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2018-01-08 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-01-08 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-01-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |