UT HB0158 | 2019 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Higher Education Student Speech Rights

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education Student Speech Rights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 8 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 44 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - House - House Comm - Refer to Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2019-03-14HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2019-03-14HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2019-03-13HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2019-03-13SenateSenate/ failed in Senate Secretary
2019-03-13SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2019-03-13SenateSenate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2019-03-11SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee
2019-03-11SenateSenate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-03-11SenateSenate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-03-07SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee
2019-03-01SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2019-03-01SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-03-01SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2019-03-01SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2019-03-01HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2019-02-28HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2019-02-26HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2019-02-26HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Judiciary Committee
2019-02-26HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Judiciary Committee
2019-02-25HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee
2019-02-25HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Judiciary Committee
2019-02-08HouseHouse Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Judiciary Committee
2019-02-05HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee
2019-02-04HouseHouse Comm - Refer to Committee in House Education Committee
2019-01-30HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Education Committee
2019-01-29HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2019-01-29HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2019-01-22HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2019-01-22 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-01-21 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback