UT HB0152 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Voted and Board Local Levy Modifications
Title
Voted and Board Local Levy Modifications
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Cox [R] | Sen. Lyle Hillyard [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-29 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2016-03-10 | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-18 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-11 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-11 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-01 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-01 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2016-01-30 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2016-01-30 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2016-01-29 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2016-01-29 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2016-01-29 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2016-01-29 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2016-01-28 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-01-25 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House | |
2016-01-20 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2016-01-15 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-01-14 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |