UT HB0145 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clean and Renewable Energy Requirement Amendments
Title
Clean and Renewable Energy Requirement Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-16 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-13 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-12 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-12 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-12 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Air Quality
Clean Fuels
Electricity
Emissions Control
Energy
Environment
Investor-owned Utilities
Public Service Commission
Public Utilities
Public Utilities & Technology
Renewable and Clean Energy
Clean Fuels
Electricity
Emissions Control
Energy
Environment
Investor-owned Utilities
Public Service Commission
Public Utilities
Public Utilities & Technology
Renewable and Clean Energy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 17 | 601 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
54 | 17 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
54 | 17 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
54 | 17 | 604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
54 | 17 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |