UT HB0145 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal Energy Tax Rate Amendments
Title
Municipal Energy Tax Rate Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - House - House Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2016-03-10 | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House | |
2016-02-15 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-15 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-12 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2016-01-28 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-01-25 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House | |
2016-01-20 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2016-01-14 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-01-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |