UT HB0145 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-25 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-25 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Renewable Energy Financing Provisions
Title
Renewable Energy Financing Provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB | |
2010-02-24 | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTBUS | |
2010-02-19 | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS | |
2010-02-18 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-18 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-16 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HDOCKET | |
2010-02-16 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0145.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2010/bills/hbillint/hb0145.pdf |