UT HB0136 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Jail Contracting and Reimbursement
Title
Jail Contracting and Reimbursement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2010-03-11 | Senate/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK | |
2010-03-03 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2010-02-23 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2010-02-22 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTLAW | |
2010-02-22 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTLAW | |
2010-02-19 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTLAW | |
2010-02-11 | House/ to standing committee in HSTLAW | |
2010-02-05 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-02-04 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |