UT HB0135 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Open and Public Meeting Modifications
Title
Open and Public Meeting Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-22 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ failed in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 2 to # 3 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-21 | Senate | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ motion to reconsider in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ failed in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-10 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-10 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-02 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-11 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-11 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
52 | 4 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
52 | 4 | 207 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |