UT HB0133 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Health Care Facility Visitation Amendments
Title
Health Care Facility Visitation Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2023-03-13 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2023-03-13 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-09 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-14 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-02-14 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-02-03 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-02-03 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2023-02-03 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2023-02-03 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-01-25 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-01-24 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-01-24 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2023-01-24 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-01-24 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-01-20 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2023-01-20 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-19 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-19 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-11 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-12-28 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-12-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Health
Health Care
Health Care Facilities
Hospitals
Immunizations
Nursing Homes
Skilled Nursing Facilities
Utah State Hospital
Health Care
Health Care Facilities
Hospitals
Immunizations
Nursing Homes
Skilled Nursing Facilities
Utah State Hospital