UT HB0132 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting Sex Transitioning Procedures on Minors
Title
Prohibiting Sex Transitioning Procedures on Minors
Sponsors
Rep. Rex Shipp [R] | Sen. Wayne Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-24 - House - House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 5 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-24 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2023-03-03 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2023-03-01 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-25 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-24 | House | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-24 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-23 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2023-01-11 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-12-29 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-12-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Health
Health Care
Health Care Professionals
Nurses
Occupational and Professional Licensing
Physician Assistants
Physicians and Surgeons
Health Care
Health Care Professionals
Nurses
Occupational and Professional Licensing
Physician Assistants
Physicians and Surgeons
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 67 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 67 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 68 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 68 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |