UT HB0132 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Sanitation Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sanitation Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - House - House/ failed (Y: 32 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-01-29 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2021-02-04HouseHouse/ failed in Clerk of the House
2021-02-04HouseHouse/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-04HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-04HouseHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-04HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-01HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-01HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Business and Labor Committee
2021-01-29HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee
2021-01-29HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Business and Labor Committee
2021-01-29HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in House Business and Labor Committee
2021-01-29HouseHouse Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Business and Labor Committee
2021-01-22HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee
2021-01-20HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-01-13HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2021-01-11 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-11 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
26151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
26152Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/HB0132.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0132.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0132S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillamd/HB0132S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0132S02.pdf
Amendmenthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/pamend/hb0132s01.hca.01.pdf
Amendmenthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/pamend/hb0132s01.hca.02.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0132.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0132.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0132S01_ComparedWith_HB0132.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0132S01.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0132S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0132S02_ComparedWith_HB0132S01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0132S02.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0132S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0132S03_ComparedWith_HB0132S02.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0132S03.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0132S03.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0132S04_ComparedWith_HB0132S02.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0132S04.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0132S04.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=18804
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=18806
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=18807
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=18808
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=244&house=H

Bill Comments 750

feedback