UT HB0132 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Local Government Licensing Amendments
Title
Local Government Licensing Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2016-03-10 | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-10 | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2016-02-22 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Secretary |
2016-02-22 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2016-02-22 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2016-02-22 | House | House/ floor amendment # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-22 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-18 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-18 | House | House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-18 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-18 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-11 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-11 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-02 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2016-02-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-01-20 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House | |
2016-01-13 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2016-01-11 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-01-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |