UT HB0131 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Election Modifications
Title
Election Modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2016-03-10 | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House | |
2016-03-09 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Rules Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Government Operations Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Government Operations Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Government Operations Committee |
2016-03-07 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2016-03-07 | House | Bill Substituted in Rules Committee in House Rules Committee |
2016-03-07 | House | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in House Rules Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2016-01-20 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House | |
2016-01-13 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | |
2016-01-08 | House | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in House Rules Committee |
2016-01-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/static/HB0131.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/hbillint/HB0131.pdf |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2016/bills/hbillint/HB0131S01.pdf |