UT HB0131 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0131S02
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Education Modernization Act
Title
Public Education Modernization Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB |
2014-02-26 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTEDU |
2014-02-26 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTEDU |
2014-02-20 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU |
2014-02-20 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2014-02-19 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2014-02-19 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2014-02-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-02-18 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-02-14 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-14 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-14 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0131S02 (Replaced by) 2014-03-06 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0131.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/hbillint/hb0131.pdf |