UT HB0131 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Custody and Parent-time Modifications
Title
Custody and Parent-time Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 46 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK | |
2011-03-07 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-07 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-03-07 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-03-03 | House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL | |
2011-03-02 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTHHS | |
2011-03-01 | House/ to standing committee in HSTHHS | |
2011-02-28 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-28 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-24 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-02-24 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |