UT HB0127 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Practice Amendments
Title
Medical Practice Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Rex Shipp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-02 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-18 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-18 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-14 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-12 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-11 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-11 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-11 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 67 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 67 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 68 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 68 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |