UT HB0125 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Intergenerational Poverty Solution
Title
Intergenerational Poverty Solution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-05 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-16 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-16 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-02-16 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-09 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-02-09 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Education Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Education Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Education Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Education Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-13 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-08 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-08 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-08 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-08 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Department of Workforce Services
Education
Higher Education
Intergenerational Poverty
Utah Education Savings Plan
Workforce Services
Education
Higher Education
Intergenerational Poverty
Utah Education Savings Plan
Workforce Services
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 235 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 253 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63I | 1 | 259 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |