UT HB0123 | 2019 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Jordan River Recreation Area Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jordan River Recreation Area Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2019-02-15SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-02-14SenateSenate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-02-14SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-02-12SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-02-11SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2019-02-11SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-02-11SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2019-02-11SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2019-02-11HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar
2019-02-06HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar
2019-02-06HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ amended/ placed on Consent Cal in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-02-05HouseHouse Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-02-05HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-02-05HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-01-30HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee
2019-01-28HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2019-01-28HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2019-01-26HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House
2019-01-22HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2019-01-09 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-01-09 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-01-09 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback