UT HB0123 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child Care Licensing Amendments
Title
Child Care Licensing Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2018-03-14 | House/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2018-03-14 | House | House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-14 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-13 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-13 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-02-13 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-02-13 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2018-02-13 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2018-02-13 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2018-02-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2018-02-12 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in Senate President |
2018-02-09 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in House Concurrence Calendar |
2018-02-09 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-09 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-09 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-05 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-05 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2018-01-29 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2018-01-29 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2018-01-29 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2018-01-25 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2018-01-25 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-01-23 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2018-01-11 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2017-12-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-12-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |