UT HB0117 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Vaccine Reporting Requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vaccine Reporting Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 3 to # 4 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 65 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ filed in House file for bills not passed
2021-03-05HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2021-03-05HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2021-03-05SenateSenate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
2021-03-03SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted/amend in Senate Substituted Bill
2021-03-02SenateSenate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2021-03-02SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2021-02-16SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2021-02-12SenateSenate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2021-02-12SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2021-02-12SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 3 to # 4 in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2021-02-01SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2021-01-29SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-01-29SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-01-28SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-01-28SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2021-01-28HouseHouse/ substituted from # 0 to # 3 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-28HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-25HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-25HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-22HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-01-22HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ amended in House Health and Human Services Committee
2021-01-21HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee
2021-01-21HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Health and Human Services Committee
2021-01-20HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2021-01-13HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2021-01-08 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-08 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
26117Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/HB0117.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0117.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillamd/HB0117.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0117S03.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0117S04.pdf
Amendmenthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/pamend/hb0117.hca.01.pdf
Amendmenthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/pamend/hb0117s04.sca.01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0117.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0117.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0117S02_ComparedWith_HB0117.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0117S02.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0117S03_ComparedWith_HB0117.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0117S03.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0117S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0117S03.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0117S04_ComparedWith_HB0117S02.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0117S04.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0117S04.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=18380
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=18381
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=122&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19621
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19624
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19625

Bill Comments 750

feedback