UT HB0104 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Homeowner Association Amendments
Title
Homeowner Association Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Senate/ substituted in SSUB | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in SSTJLC | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-28 | House/ to Senate in SSEC | |
2011-02-28 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-02-24 | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTBUS | |
2011-02-23 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTBUS | |
2011-02-07 | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS | |
2011-02-07 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-02 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-01 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-02-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |