UT HB0104 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Unlawful Provision of Identifiable Prescription Information
Title
Unlawful Provision of Identifiable Prescription Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - House - House Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | House/ strike enacting clause in HFILE | |
2010-03-02 | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTHHS | |
2010-01-29 | House/ to standing committee in HSTHHS | |
2010-01-29 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-26 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-01-25 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-01-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |