UT HB0102S01 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB0102
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Governor Vetoed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Governor Vetoed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Assessment Area Amendments
Title
Assessment Area Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House/ concurs with Senate amendment (Y: 58 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Governor Vetoed in LTGOV | |
2014-03-21 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2014-03-20 | House | House/ enrolled bill to Printing in HCLERK |
2014-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-19 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-16 | Bill Received from House for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-13 | House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2014-03-13 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2014-03-13 | House | Senate/ signed by President/ returned to House in HSPKR |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House/ concurs with Senate amendment in SPRES |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in HCURCAL |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-13 | House | Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK |
2014-03-13 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in S2ND |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2014-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in S2ND |
2014-03-12 | Senate | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in S2ND |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in SSTRUL |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTGOP |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTGOP |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTGOP |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO |
2014-02-27 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-02-27 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-02-27 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-14 | House | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDHB |
2014-02-14 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in HSTPOL |
2014-02-14 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTPOL |
2014-02-14 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTPOL |
2014-02-10 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTPOL |
2014-02-10 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2014-02-05 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-02-05 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-02-04 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-04 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0102 (Replaces) 2014-03-13 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB