UT HB0093 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Youth Suicide Prevention Programs Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youth Suicide Prevention Programs Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-03-03HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2021-03-02HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2021-03-02HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2021-03-02SenateSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate President
2021-03-02SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-03-02SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2021-03-02SenateSenate/ committee report favorable in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2021-03-01SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2021-02-22SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2021-02-19SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-02-19SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-02-18SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-02-18SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2021-02-18HouseHouse/ substituted from # 0 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-18HouseHouse/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-17HouseHouse/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-17HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-11HouseHouse/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-11HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-04HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-04HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ amended in House Health and Human Services Committee
2021-02-03HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee
2021-02-03HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Health and Human Services Committee
2021-01-26HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee
2021-01-26HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-01-13HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2021-01-05 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2021-01-05 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53F5206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
53G9702Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/static/HB0093.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0093.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillamd/HB0093.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0093S02.pdf
Amendmenthttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/pamend/hb0093.hca.01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0093.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0093.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0093S01_ComparedWith_HB0093.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0093S01.pna.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0093S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/~2021/bills/hbillint/HB0093S02_ComparedWith_HB0093S01.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0093S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2021/HB0093S02.pna.pdf
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19008
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=19010
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=547&house=H
Roll Callhttps://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=20605
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2021GS&voteid=1241&house=S

Bill Comments

feedback