UT HB0092 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by HB0092S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - House/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Utah Telehealth and Education Network Amendments
Title
Utah Telehealth and Education Network Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2014-02-10 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in HSUB |
2014-02-07 | House | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in HSTHHS |
2014-02-07 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation in HSTHHS |
2014-02-06 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTHHS |
2014-02-05 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL |
2014-02-05 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL |
2014-02-04 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL |
2014-01-31 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-01-31 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK |
2014-01-30 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-01-30 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-01-30 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
HB0092S01 (Replaced by) 2014-03-27 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/htmdoc/hbillhtm/HB0092.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/hbillint/hb0092.pdf |