UT HB0088 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Electronic Cigarette and Other Nicotine Product Amendments
Title
Electronic Cigarette and Other Nicotine Product Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-06 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-03-05 | House | House/ substituted from # 2 to # 4 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-03-05 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-03-02 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-03-02 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-03-02 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-27 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2018-02-23 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2018-02-23 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2018-02-20 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2018-01-23 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-01-11 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2018-01-11 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2017-12-19 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-12-19 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |