UT HB0087 | 2021 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Electronic Information and Data Privacy Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic Information and Data Privacy Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-02-24 Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-02-22 House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2021-02-22HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2021-02-22HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2021-02-22HouseSenate/ signed by President/ returned to House in House Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Senate President
2021-02-22SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2021-02-17SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2021-02-17SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-17SenateSenate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-17SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-16SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-11SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2021-02-11SenateSenate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2021-02-11SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2021-02-11SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2021-02-11HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-05HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
2021-02-05HouseHouse/ committee report favorable in House Judiciary Committee
2021-02-04HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Judiciary Committee
2021-01-25HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Judiciary Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2021-01-19HouseHouse/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
2021-01-13HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Clerk of the House
2021-01-06HouseHouse/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
2020-12-30 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-30 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2020-12-30 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback